EP1650856 - Power supply apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jong-boo 203 Daerae Jutaek, 1273-2, Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05109593.3 | 14.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | KR20040084803 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: KR 2004084803 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650856 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650856 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26, H02M1/088, H02J9/06, H02J1/10 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
H02J9/061 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (KR);
G06F1/263 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | H02M1/088, H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2007/12] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromversorgungsvorrichtung | [2006/17] | English: | Power supply apparatus | [2006/17] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation électrique | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4617473 (BINGHAM DAVID [US]) [X] 1-6,11 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5306961 (LEE ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1-6,11 * column 12, line 66 - column 13, line 38; figure 24 *; | [A]EP0622883 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] * column 31, line 33 - line 53 *; | [X]US5608273 (BARTLETT DONALD M [US]) [X] 1-6,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5703415 (TANAKA TOSHIMASA [JP]) [X] 1-6,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5783964 (EITAN BOAZ [IL]) [X] 1-6,11 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 47; figure 1 *; | [X]US2002171295 (NITTA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0042] - [0050]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2003193363 (EGAN PATRICK KEVIN [US]) [X] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016]; figure 1 * |