EP1621197 - Composition comprising a steroid and an anticholinergic agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banholzer, Rolf BOHERINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Pfulling 70597, Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Meade, Christopher BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Am Strud 88437, Maselheim / DE | 03 /
Meissner, Helmut BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Hallgart 55218, Ingelheim / DE | 04 /
Morschhaeuser, Gerd BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Rissegge 88400, Biberach / DE | 05 /
Pairet, Michel BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Obere S 88400, Biberach / DE | 06 /
Pieper, Michael P. BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Geschwis 88400, Biberach / DE | 07 /
Pohl, Gerald BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Akazienw 88400, Biberach / DE | 08 /
Reichl, Richard BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG Im Hippe 55435, Gau-Algesheim / DE | 09 /
Speck, Georg BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO. KG In der B 55218, Ingelheim / DE | [2006/05] | Application number, filing date | 05109887.9 | 09.04.2003 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | DE2002116429 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10216429 | [2006/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621197 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621197 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/46, A61K31/56, A61P11/06, A61P11/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/56 (EP,KR);
A61K31/46 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4745 (EP);
A61K31/573 (EP);
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K9/12 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | LT | 06.07.2010 | LV | 06.07.2010 | Title | German: | Arzneimittel enthaltend Steroide und ein Anticholinergikum | [2006/05] | English: | Composition comprising a steroid and an anticholinergic agent | [2006/05] | French: | Composition comprenant un stéröide et un anticholinérgique | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03712137.3 / EP1496902 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030712137) is 31.05.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0823423 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20* page 1 *; | [A]WO0178745 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 1 - line 17 *; | [PX]WO0232899 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [PX] 1-8,10,11,20 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 25, paragraph 2 * * page 26, line 26 - line 38 * * claims 8,10 *; | [PA]WO0236106 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) | by applicant | US4570630 | DE3625685 | WO9114468 | WO9216528 | WO9407607 | WO9428958 | WO9712687 | WO9712683 | WO9720590 |