EP1779993 - Apparatus and method of manufacturing a thermoplastic container by blow moulding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisapack Holding SA Rue de la Praise 31 1896 Vouvry / CH | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitzig, Andreas AISAPACK S.A. rue de la Praise 31 1896 Vouvry / CH | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Intellectual Property Services Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 05110049.3 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779993 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779993 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/48, B29C49/78, // B29C49/12, B29C49/18, B29C49/06 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B29C49/78 (EP,US);
B29C49/18 (EP,US);
B29C49/4802 (EP);
B29C2049/7831 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines thermoplastischen Behälters durch Blasformen | [2007/18] | English: | Apparatus and method of manufacturing a thermoplastic container by blow moulding | [2007/18] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de fabrication d'un récipient thermoplastique par soufflage | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.2009 | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IE | 04.03.2009 | LT | 04.03.2009 | LV | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | PL | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | ES | 15.06.2009 | IS | 04.07.2009 | PT | 18.08.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | GB | 26.10.2009 | LU | 26.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
GB | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
GB | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
GB | 26.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0524099 ; | JPH0524099 [ ]; | [Y]US4364721 (RAINVILLE DEWEY) [Y] 10-17 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 56; figures 3-6 *; | [Y]US4547333 (TAKADA TAKUZO [JP]) [Y] 10-17 * column 3, line 48 - column 3, line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9950047 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 11 - page 12; figure 11 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930608), vol. 017, no. 300, Database accession no. (M - 1426), & JP05024099 A 19930202 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-9 * abstract * [Y] 10-17 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 10, Database accession no. 1993-079938, XP002373755 & JPH0524099 A 19930202 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [ ] * abstract * |