EP1674644 - Closing device for an opening, sliding in partly-opened position, corresponding vehicle and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wagon SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet ZI No. 2 79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states WAGON SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet ZI No. 2 79302 Bressuire Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Destouches, Nicolas 20, rue du Lindon 35650, Le Rheu / FR | 02 /
Moreau, Stéphane 13, rue de l'Arceau 79700, Le Temple / FR | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Bioret, Ludovic, et al Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Bioret, Ludovic, et al Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05110907.2 | 17.11.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | FR20040012919 | 03.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0412919 | [2006/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674644 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/58, B60J1/12 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
E05D15/58 (EP);
E05D2015/1031 (EP);
E05D2015/586 (EP);
E05Y2900/516 (EP);
E05Y2900/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abschlussvorrichtung für eine Öffnung, schiebend in teilweise ausgeschwenkter Position; Fahrzeug und Verfahren dafür. | [2006/26] | English: | Closing device for an opening, sliding in partly-opened position, corresponding vehicle and process | [2006/26] | French: | Dispositif d'obturation d'une baie, entrebâillant et coulissant, véhicule et procédé correspondants. | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/06] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1332739 (VEHICULES IND ET DEQUIPMENTS M) [X] 1,3,6,7,11-13 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 43 * * figure - * [Y] 4; | [XY]US5398988 (DEREES DELBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-13 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 20 * * figure - * [Y] 4; | [A]EP0683064 (SCHADE KG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 14 * * figure - *; | [DA]EP0857844 (WAGON AUTOMOTIVE [FR]) [DA] 1 * column 7, line 34 - line 51 ** figure - *; | [X]US2003204995 (MATSUMURA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,11-13 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] * * figure - * |