EP1683882 - Aluminium alloy with low quench sensitivity and process for the manufacture of a semi-finished product of this alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Fuchs KG Derschlager Strasse 26 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilpert, Matthias Dr.-Ing. Eickenstrasse 22 51709 Marienheide / DE | 02 /
Terlinde, Gregor, Dr. Hubertusweg 4a 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | 03 /
Fischer, Gernot, Dr. Nietzscheweg 7 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Haverkamp, Jens Gartenstrasse 61 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Stefanstrasse 2 Kirchhoffgebäude 58638 Iserlohn / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Haverkamp, Jens Patentanwalt Postfach 1662 58586 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 05111026.0 | 21.11.2005 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | DE20051002390 | 19.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005002390 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683882 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683882 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1683882 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/10, C22F1/053 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
C22F1/053 (EP,US);
C22C1/06 (EP,US);
C22C21/10 (EP,US);
C22F1/002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/14] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abschreckunempfindliche Aluminiumlegierung sowie Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Halbzeuges aus dieser Legierung | [2006/30] | English: | Aluminium alloy with low quench sensitivity and process for the manufacture of a semi-finished product of this alloy | [2006/30] | French: | Alliage d'Aluminium avec sensitivité à la trempe réduite et procédé de fabrication d'un produit demi-final lors de cet alliage | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2008
16.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALCAN FRANCE SAS (FR) / ALCAN RHENALU (FR) / ALCAN ALUMINIUM VALAIS SA (CH) 17 Place des Reflets, La Défense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Fénot, Dominique Alcan Centre de Recherches de Voreppe 725, rue Aristide Berges- BP 27 38341 Voreppe / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2008
16.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALCAN FRANCE SAS (FR) / ALCAN RHENALU (FR) / ALCAN ALUMINIUM VALAIS SA (CH) 17 Place des Reflets, La Défense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Fénot, Dominique Alcan Centre de Recherches de Voreppe 725, rue Aristide Berges- BP 27 38341 Voreppe / FR | ||
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2008
16.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALCAN FRANCE SAS (FR) / ALCAN RHENALU (FR) / ALCAN ALUMINIUM VALAIS SA (CH) 17 Place des Reflets, La Défense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Fénot, Dominique Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2008
16.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE ALCAN FRANCE SAS (FR) / ALCAN RHENALU (FR) / ALCAN ALUMINIUM VALAIS SA (CH) 17 Place des Reflets, La Défense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR Opponent's representative Fénot, Dominique Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | 21.08.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.02.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.11.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.05.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4629517 (LIFKA BERNARD W [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 12 - column 10, line 68 * * table 5 * [Y] 14; | [A]JPH08295976 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [A] * EPODOC Abstract * * table 1 *; | [A]EP1241275 (G PREDPR VSEROSSIISKY NII AVIA [RU], et al) [A] * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0031] * * table 1 *; | US2003219353 [ ] (WARNER TIMOTHY [FR], et al); | [A]FR2853667 (CORUS ALUMINIUM WALZPROD GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y] - Aluminium and Aluminium alloys, MATERIALS PARC, OH, ED. J.R. DAVIS, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1993), XP002369750 [Y] 14 * page 265 - page 274 * | [A] - H.J. KOLKMAN, W.G.J. 'THART, L. SCHRA, Quench sensitivity of airframe aluminium alloys, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, STRENGTH OF METALS AND ALLOYS (ICSMA 8), PROC. OF THE 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (1988), XP009062512 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - G. FISCHER, F.W. LYNKER, M. MARKWORTH, "Eine abschreckunempfindliche AlZnMgCu-Legierung mit Zusätzen von Chrom, Zircon und Silber", ALUMINIUM, (1972), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 413 - 418, XP009062511 [A] * the whole document * | Opposition | US3943039 | US3945861 | US4049474 | US4063936 | JPS58161747 | EP1241275 | WO03085145 | - extrait de "Teal sheets, the Aluminum Association" Revised October 2002 | - "Investigations into the Possibility of Reducing Quench-Sensitivity in High- Strength Al-Zn-Mg-Cu Alloys", H.A. Holl, Journal of the Institute of Metals, 1969, Vol 97, pages 200 - 205 | - "Kupferhaltige AlZnMg-Knetlegierungen - Eigenschaften und Entwicklungstendenzen, Teil I : Schrifttumsauswertung" ALUMINUM vOL 48, 1972 PAGES 724-733 | - "Effects of copper on precipitation and quench sensitivity of AlZnMg alloys" R:J. Livak and J.M. Papazian, Scripta Metallurgica, 1984, Vol 18 pp483-488 | - K.R. Van Horn, Editor "Aluminum Vol III Fabrication and Finishing", American Society for Metals, 1967, pp 22-24 | - J.E. Hatch, Editor "Aluminium, properties and physical metallurgy", ASM, 1984, S. 165 | - Druck der Abbildung 24 von D13 in Internationalen Einheiten | - ASM Specialty Handbook Aluminium and aluminium alloys, eds. J.R. Davis, 1993, Seiten 41, 45 und 46 Entwicklung der Abschreckempfindlichkeit der Legierung 7046 | - Aerospace Structural Metals Handbook, Eds. 1997, Vol. 3, Seite 5 |