EP1666923 - Procedure for locating mobile magnetic targets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 29-33, rue de la Fédération BP 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAFOREST, Pierre 4 bis, rue des Violettes 38100, GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
MANET, Pascal 4, place de la Saint Jean Parc des Faurys 13770, VENELLES / FR | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Philippe, et al Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Ahner, Philippe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2008/22] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/23] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05111455.1 | 29.11.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | FR20040052831 | 01.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0452831 | [2006/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1666923 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/08 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G01V3/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lokalisierung beweglicher magnetischer Ziele | [2006/23] | English: | Procedure for locating mobile magnetic targets | [2006/23] | French: | Procédé de localisation de cibles magnétiques mobiles | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US5684396 (AKS STANLEY O [US], et al) [DX] 16,18-22 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 35 *[A] 1; | [A]US6675123 (EDELSTEIN ALAN S [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 50 * | by applicant | US5387853 | US5684396 | US6292758 |