EP1669493 - Modular machine for producing or/and treating or/and handling a running web of material, in particular of paper or cardboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cedra, Ingolf Gmünder Weg 15 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
Begemann, Ulrich Sachsenweg 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
Kurz, Roland Schmale Strasse 4 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 04 /
Mayer, Wolfgang Uracher Weg 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 05 /
Sterz, Helmut Härtsfeldstr. 12 73466 Lauchheim / DE | 06 /
Marold, Peter Carl-Schwenk-Str. 14/2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05111678.8 | 05.12.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | DE20041059402 | 09.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004059402 | [2006/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1669493 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D21F9/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
D21F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Modulare Maschine zur Herstellung oder/und Behandlung oder/und Handhabung einer laufenden Materialbahn insbesondere aus Papier oder Karton | [2006/24] | English: | Modular machine for producing or/and treating or/and handling a running web of material, in particular of paper or cardboard | [2006/24] | French: | Machine modulaire pour la fabrication ou/et le traitement ou/et la manipulation d'une bande de matériau en mouvement, notamment en papier ou carton | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1391993 (COLLIN H) [X] 1,9,12,14,37,41,42,44 * page 1, line 74 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 100 - page 4, line 94 * * figure - * [Y] 35; | [XY]US4239593 (DUNSMOOR EARL W JR [US]) [X] 1,9,12,14,37,41,42,44 * column 2, lines 34-50 * * column 5, line 26 - column 7, line 10 * * figure - * [Y] 35; | [XY]DE4037423 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 26,27 * column 3, lines 39-63 * * column 4, lines 44-54 * * figure - *[Y] 35; | [XY]US5829159 (HODGINS GARY W [CA], et al) [X] 1,9,12,14,37,41,42,44 * column 2, lines 4-39 * * column 4, line 64 - column 6, line 24 * * figure - * [Y] 35; | [XY]EP1437516 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9,12,14,37,41,42,44 * paragraphs [0018] - [0029] * * figure - * [Y] 35 |