EP1806685 - Temporary exclusions and alternatives of plants and products during sourcing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreuels, Carsten Im Spiss 4 66497, Contwig / DE | 02 /
von Helmolt, Hans-Ulrich Rohrbacher Str. 195 69126, Heidelberg / DE | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Günther Martin, et al Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Schneider, Günther Martin, et al Bettinger Schneider Schramm, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05111711.7 | 05.12.2005 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806685 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Title | German: | Vorübergehende Ausschlüsse und Alternativen von Anlagen und Produkten während der Beschaffung | [2007/28] | English: | Temporary exclusions and alternatives of plants and products during sourcing | [2007/28] | French: | Exclusions temporaire et alternatives d'établissements et des produits au cours de la fourniture | [2007/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2011 | 15.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/19] | 15.12.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | Examination | US6167380 | - ORACLE, "Oracle Global Order Promising 11i.10", ORACLE DATA SHEET, ORACLE, US, (20050501), pages 1 - 6, XP002364227 |