EP1675218 - Connector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Gunther Am Dorfweiher 8 A 93142 Maxhütte-Haidhof / DE | 02 /
Höhe, Stefan Am Hohen Ranken 12 93161 Sinzing / DE | 03 /
Weber, Christoph Muldenstr. 25 84061 Ergoldsbach / DE | [2006/26] | Application number, filing date | 05111747.1 | 06.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | DE20041062850 | 27.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062850 | [2006/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1675218 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1675218 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
H01R4/483 (EP);
H01R4/4821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anschlussvorrichtung | [2006/26] | English: | Connector device | [2006/26] | French: | Dispositif de connexion | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 29.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2922477 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0955692 (WECO WESTER EBBINGHAUS GMBH & [DE]); | [A]EP1309036 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | [A]EP1383203 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) |