EP1686585 - Information recording and reproducing apparatus and information recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usui, Takashi Toshiba Corp., IP Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minatu-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Ogawa, Akihito Toshiba Corp., IP Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minatu-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Noda, Chosaku Toshiba Corp., IP Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minatu-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Kashihara, Yutaka Toshiba Corp., IP Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minatu-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05112002.0 | 13.12.2005 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | JP20050024482 | 31.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005024482 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686585 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B27/24, G11B7/0045, G11B7/007, G11B27/034 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabevorrichtung sowie Informationsaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2006/31] | English: | Information recording and reproducing apparatus and information recording method | [2006/31] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de lecture d'informations et procédé d'enregistrement d'informations | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 15.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0709843 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6-8 * figures 17-19 *; | [A]US2002136134 (ITO MOTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003210896 (MATSUNO KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 6-8 *; | [A]WO2005006314 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1622152 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1,2,6,7* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0042] *; | [EL]EP1638098 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1-10 * L: *doubt of validity of priority, prior proposal of the same applicant*; paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0195] * [L] ; | [Y] - ECMA : STANDARDIZING INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, "80 mm (1,46 Gbytes per side) and 120 mm (4,70 Gbytes per side) DVD Re-recordable Disk (DVD-RW)", STANDARD ECMA, XX, XX, (200212), pages 1 - 148, XP002339283 [Y] 1-3,6-8 * page 42 - page 53 * * page 71 - page 90 * * page 131 - page 140 * |