EP1686235 - "One-way valve for a side pocket mandrel of a gas lift system" [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb Inc. 515 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Ronald W. 2514 Cooling Breeze Dr. Richmond, TX Texas 77469 / US | 02 /
Salihbegovic, Zlatko 2018 La Belle Villa New Iberia, LA Louisiana 70563 / US | 03 /
Ricketts, Dave 3742 Post Oak Ave. New Orleans, LA Louisiana 70131 / US | 04 /
Robinson, Jerry W. 200 Verret St. New Orleans, LA Louisiana 70114 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/31] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05112053.3 | 13.12.2005 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | US20040023990 | 28.12.2004 Original published format: US 23990 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686235 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686235 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/12 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
E21B43/123 (EP,US);
E21B43/122 (US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einwegventil für Mantelrohr mit Seitentasche | [2006/31] | English: | "One-way valve for a side pocket mandrel of a gas lift system" | [2006/31] | French: | Valve unidirectionnelle pour un mandrin avec poche latérale | [2007/39] |
Former [2006/31] | Valve unidirectionelle pour un mandrin avec poche latérale | Examination procedure | 17.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 03.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4333527 (HIGGINS ROBERT S, et al) [X] 1-26 * column 5, lines 58-65 ** column 20, lines 35-65; figures 17,18 * |