EP1675196 - Method for manufacturing a thin film transistor and a flat panel display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/26] | Thin film transistors, flat panel display including the thin film transistor and method for manufacturing the thin film transistor and the flat panel display | ||
[2009/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/09] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Nam-Choul Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hye-Dong Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
SUH, Min-Chul Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KOO, Jae-Bon, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LEE, Sang-Min, c/o Samsung SDI Co.Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
LEE, Hun-Jung, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/43] |
Former [2006/26] | 01 /
YANG, Nam-Choul Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-g Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Hye-Dong Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-g Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
SUH, Min-Chul Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-g Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
KOO, Jae-Bon, c/o Samsing SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
LEE, Sang-Min, c/o Samsung SDI Co.Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
LEE, Hun-Jung, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/26] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Scheider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05112462.6 | 20.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | KR20040111097 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004111097 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1675196 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1675196 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/56, H01L51/10 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
H10K71/211 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
H10K10/462 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/113 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | H01L51/40, H01L51/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/10] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsmethoden für Dünnschichttransistor und Flachbildschirm | [2009/42] | English: | Method for manufacturing a thin film transistor and a flat panel display | [2009/42] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un transitor à couche mince et d'un écran plat | [2009/42] |
Former [2006/26] | Dünnschichttransistor, Flachbildschirm mit Dünnschichttransistor und Herstellungsmethoden für Dünnschichttransistor und Flachbildschirm | ||
Former [2006/26] | Thin film transistors, flat panel display including the thin film transistor and method for manufacturing the thin film transistor and the flat panel display | ||
Former [2006/26] | Transistor à couche mince, écran plat comprenant le transistor à couche mince et méthode de fabrication du transitor à couche mince et de l'écran plat | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 28.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5705826 (ARATANI SUKEKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 17, lines 19-27 *; | [X]WO0108241 (E INK CORP [US]) [X] 1,19 * page 2, lines 6-28; figure 3 * * page 6, lines 8-21 *; | [XY]US6498114 (AMUNDSON KARL [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8-10,12,15,17-24 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 2; figure 3 * * column 4, lines 59-62 * * column 5, lines 12-54 * [Y] 4,5,7; | [PX]US2005064623 (BAO ZHENAN [US]) [PX] 1-3,6,8-12,15,17-24 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0018] - [0020]; figure 1 *; | [Y] - YAGI IWAO ET AL, "Direct observation of contact and channel resistance in pentacene four-terminal thin-film transistor patterned by laser ablation method", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20040202), vol. 84, no. 5, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 813 - 815, XP012062006 [Y] 4,5 * page 814, column 2, lines 10-16; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1645316 | [Y] - SONG C-K, "EFFECTS OF HYDROPHOBIC TREATMENT ON THE PERFORMANCE OF PENTACENE TFT", KIEE INTERNATIONAL TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTROPHYSICS AND APPLICATIONS, KR, (20010716), vol. 12C, no. 2, ISSN 1598-2610, pages 136 - 138, XP009012128 [Y] 7 * page 136, column 2, lines 12-17 * | by applicant | US6498114 | - F. DINELLI, SYNTHETIC METALS, (2004), vol. 146, pages 373 - 376 | - BRAINS A. MATTIES, MAT. RES. SOC. SYMP. PROC., (2003), vol. 771 |