EP1677009 - Trunnion element, in particular for an actuating cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth Teknik AB Varuvägen 7, Älvsjö 125 81 Stockholm / SE | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Granberg, Rune Gamla Magelungsvägen 58 12534, Älvsjö / SE | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Kietzmann, Lutz, et al Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Kietzmann, Lutz, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05112538.3 | 20.12.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | DE20041063679 | 31.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004063679 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677009 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1677009 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/04, F15B15/14, F16B37/04, F16B7/18 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
F15B15/1428 (EP);
F15B15/04 (EP);
F16B37/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | Zapfenelement, insbesondere für einen Antriebzylinder | [2006/27] | English: | Trunnion element, in particular for an actuating cylinder | [2006/27] | French: | Elément de tourillon, en particulier pour un vérin | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/27] | Element de tourillon, en particulier pour un vérin | Examination procedure | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | BE | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | LT | 23.04.2008 | LV | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | PL | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | ES | 03.08.2008 | IS | 23.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | IE | 20.12.2008 | LU | 20.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
IE | 20.12.2008 | ||
LU | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 20.12.2008 | ||
LU | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
IE | 20.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 23.04.2008 | |
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2979369 (FLICK FRANCIS S, et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 11 *; | [X]FR2425567 (OUTILLAGE AIR COMPRIME [FR]) [X] 1,3,9 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 5 *; | [A]EP0601736 (PARKER HANNIFIN PLC [GB]) [A] 1,9* column 6, line 14 - column 6, line 34; figures 7-9 * | by applicant | EP0495848 |