EP1652924 - Polypeptide, cDNA encoding the same and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukushima, Daikichi Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Minase Res. Inst.,1-1-3 Sakurai Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
Shibayama, Shiro Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd Minase Res. Inst.,1-1-3 Sakurai Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 03 /
Tada, Hideaki Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Minase Res. Inst.,1-1-3 Sakurai Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Schön, Christoph, et al Kroher.Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/18] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05112635.7 | 13.05.1999 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | JP19980131815 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: JP 13181598 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1652924 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1652924 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K38/17, G01N33/50, C12N9/64 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N9/6421 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, A61K38/17, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2006/18] | Title | German: | Polypeptide, cDNA, welche diese kodiert und deren Verwendung | [2006/18] | English: | Polypeptide, cDNA encoding the same and use thereof | [2006/18] | French: | Polypeptide, l'ADNc qui la code et leur utilisation | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 12.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99919566.2 / EP1077259 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9918126 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3-10 * abstract *; | [E]WO0009709 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3-10 * abstract *; | [E]WO0012708 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3-10 * abstract * * page 173, line 25 - page 175, line 22 * * page 305, line 35 - page 306, line 2 * * page 337, line 23 - line 28 *; | [EL]EP1022286 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [EL] 1,3-10* abstract *; | [X] - CATASUS LLUIS ET AL, "The sequence and conformation of human pancreatic procarboxypeptidase A2: cDNA cloning, sequence analysis, and three-dimensional model", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6651 - 6657, XP002392171 [X] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.12.6651 |