EP1801748 - Method for handling accounts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlsson, Stefan Ericsson AB Bastionsgatan 4 37132, Karlskrona / SE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Björn E., et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Andersson, Björn E., et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Asketorp, Göran, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 05112918.7 | 23.12.2005 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801748 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kontoverwaltung | [2007/26] | English: | Method for handling accounts | [2007/26] | French: | Procédé pour gérer des comptes | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | 16.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | Examination | EP0917337 |