EP1554975 - Synthesizing a reference value in an electrocardial waveform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blakley, Daniel Robert 336 S. 30TH Street Philomath OR 97370 / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250150.9 | 13.01.2005 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | US20040758813 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: US 758813 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554975 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554975 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0428, H03F3/45 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
H03F3/45475 (EP,US);
A61B5/308 (US);
A61B5/30 (EP);
H03F3/45941 (EP,US);
H03F2200/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/15] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EKG-Referenzwertberechnung | [2005/29] | English: | Synthesizing a reference value in an electrocardial waveform | [2005/29] | French: | Calcul d'une valeur de référence d'un électrocardiogramme | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 06.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 22.10.2008 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/27] | NL | 22.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4446868 (ARONSON ALFRED L [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4545380 (SCHROEPPEL EDWARD A [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8706447 (CERNJAVIC DRAGO, et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5503159 (BURTON DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 21 - column 22 *; | [A]US5615687 (PRITCHARD BRUCE A [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3 - column 6 *; | [A]US6032069 (ELGAVISH GABRIEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |