EP1557792 - Medical image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Medical & Graphic, Inc. 1 Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2008/09] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Konica Minolta Medical & Graphic, Inc. 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Satoshi 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
Kasai, Satosh 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | Representative(s) | Brown, George Laurence, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Brown, George Laurence, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250234.1 | 18.01.2005 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | JP20040010825 | 19.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004010825 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1557792 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1557792 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06F19/00, G06K9/62 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur medizinischen Bildverarbeitung | [2005/30] | English: | Medical image processing apparatus | [2005/30] | French: | Système pour le traitement d'images médicaux | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002165837 (ZHANG HONG [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0086] * [Y] 2-4,7-9; | [XY]US2003161522 (CAMPANINI RENATO [IT], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0044] * [Y] 2-4,7-9; | [Y]US2003200188 (MOGHADDAM BABACK [US]) [Y] 2-4 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XY] - EL-NAQA I ET AL, "A support vector machine approach for detection of microcalcifications in mammograms'", PROCEEDINGS 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP 2002. ROCHESTER, NY, SEPT. 22 - 25, 2002, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020922), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7622-6, pages 953 - 956, XP010608131 [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,7-9 | [Y] - KE H ET AL, "Editing support vector machines", PROC INT JT CONF NEURAL NETWORKS; PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS 2001, (2001), vol. 2, pages 1464 - 1467, XP002360879 [Y] 7-9 * page 1464 - page 1465 * | [Y] - XUEGONG ZHANG ED - YU-HEN HU LARSEN J ET AL, "Using class-center vectors to build support vector machines", NEURAL NETWORKS FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING IX, 1999. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP. MADISON, WI, USA 23-25 AUG. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990823), ISBN 0-7803-5673-X, pages 3 - 11, XP010348470 [Y] 7-9 * page 3 - page 4 * * page 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NNSP.1999.788117 | [Y] - MULLER K -R ET AL, "An introduction to kernel-based learning algorithms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS IEEE USA, (200103), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1045-9227, pages 181 - 201, XP002360880 [Y] 2-4 * page 186, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/72.914517 |