EP1564714 - Display device, liquid crytal monitor, liquid crystal television receiver, and display method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Hidekazu 209 1-chome Torisumi Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0025 / JP | 02 /
Ishihara, Tomoyuki 126-1, Ta-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0073 / JP | 03 /
Tomizawa, Kazunari 5-1-3-22-204, Kabutodai Kizu-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | [2015/10] |
Former [2005/33] | 01 /
Miyata, Hidekazu 209 1-chome Torisumi Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0025 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishihara, Tomoyuki 126-1, Ta-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0073 / JP | |||
03 /
Tomizawa, Kazunari 5-1-3-22-204, Kabutodai Kizu-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/51] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250294.5 | 21.01.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | JP20040013391 | 21.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004013391 | JP20050012329 | 20.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005012329 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1564714 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1564714 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1564714 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G09G3/3611 (EP,US);
G09G3/36 (KR);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G2300/0443 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0447 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0876 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0276 (EP,US);
G09G2320/028 (EP,US);
G09G2320/041 (EP,US);
G09G2360/18 (EP,US);
G09G3/2029 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE | ||
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigegerät, Flüssigkristallanzeige, Flüssigkristall-Fernsehempfänger, und Anzeigeverfahren | [2005/33] | English: | Display device, liquid crytal monitor, liquid crystal television receiver, and display method | [2005/33] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage, moniteur à cristaux liquides, téléviseur à cristaux liquides, et méthode d'affichage | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5923310 (KIM DONG-GYU [KR]) [A] 1-69* column 15, line 39 - column 16, line 51 *; | [X]US2002036625 (NAKAMURA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 20,33,44,50 * paragraphs [0161] , [0163]; figure 24 *; | [X]US2003006952 (HONG HYUNG KI [KR]) [X] 1-13,20-31,33-55 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2003146893 (SAWABE DAIICHI [JP]) [DA] 1-69 * paragraphs [0105] , [0115] - [0118]; figures 2,3,7,10 * * paragraphs [0189] - [0239]; figures 14-17 * * paragraphs [0326] , [0331] - [0334]; figures 33,34,38,39 *; | [DX]US2003227429 (SHIMOSHIKIRYO FUMIKAZU [JP]) [DX] 14-19,32,56-69 * paragraph [0088]; figure 4c * * paragraphs [0092] , [0093] *; | [E]EP1553553 (CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORP [CN]) [E] 1,31,34 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003006952 | JP2003295160 | JP2004062146 | JP2004078157 | JP2004258139 |