EP1564073 - Vehicle load-carrying devices mounting on a tow-ball [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yates, Peter Alan 68 Main road, Austrey Atherstone Warwickshire CV9 3EG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Yater, Peter Alan 68 Main road, Austrey Atherstone, Warwickshire CV9 3EG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 05250797.7 | 11.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | GB20040003090 | 12.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0403090 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1564073 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1564073 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/06, B60D1/58, B60D1/36 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B60D1/06 (EP);
B60D1/58 (EP);
B60R9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | Trägereinrichtung für Fahrzeug zum befestigen auf dem Anhängerkupplung | [2005/49] | English: | Vehicle load-carrying devices mounting on a tow-ball | [2005/33] | French: | Dispositif porteur pour véhicule fixable sur attache caravane | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/33] | Trägereinrichtung für Fahrzeug zum Befestigen auf der Anhängerkupplung | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/38] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2008/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP08003515.7 / EP2048034 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2125747 (COPLESTON BERNARD) [X] 1-3 * page 2, lines 7-13; figure - * [Y] 4; | [A]US4620736 (SHANKS TEDDY L [US]) [A] 1,5 * figure - *; | [XY]GB2197273 (ADAMS ANTHONY NOEL) [X] 1 [Y] 4; | [Y]US5236110 (SCHMIDT ERIK [DK]) [Y] 4* figure 2 *; | [X]GB2383784 (YATES PETE [GB]) [X] 1 * figure - * |