EP1564817 - Photodiode having light-absorption part separated by PN junction and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Tae-jin 514-1902 Shinnamushil 5-danji Apt Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Jin-Hyeong 2-805, Seoul Apt. Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250817.3 | 10.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | KR20040008845 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: KR 2004008845 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1564817 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/101, H01L31/0232 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
H01L31/101 (EP);
H01L31/02327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, SE [2006/19] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photodiode mit einer durch einen PN-Übergang getrennten lichtabsorbierenden Zone und Herstellungsverfahren dazu | [2005/33] | English: | Photodiode having light-absorption part separated by PN junction and method of fabricating the same | [2005/33] | French: | Photodiode avec une zone d' absorption de la lumière séparée par une jonction PN et méthode de fabrication | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/40] | 16.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0481552 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 [A] 10-15; | [XA]US5204520 (GREEN SAMUEL I [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12,14 * column 4, line 4 - column 6, line 16; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,9,15; | [XA]EP0621639 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,10,12,14 * column 4, line 39 - column 8, line 27; figures 1-4,7-9 * [A] 11,13; | [A]US2002096696 (EOM JAE-WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003168658 (FUKUSHIMA TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003168709 (KASHIURA YUKIKO [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [PA] - PARK C H ET AL, "n-ZnO/p-Si photodiodes fully isolated by B<+> ion-implantation", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - B: BEAM INTERACTIONS WITH MATERIALS AND ATOMS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200402), vol. 216, ISSN 0168-583X, pages 127 - 130, XP004489490 [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nimb.2003.11.031 |