EP1564335 - Drainage system flow regulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACO Technologies plc Hitchin Road Shefford Beds SG17 5TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states ACO Technologies plc Hitchin Road Shefford, Beds SG17 5TE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mc Intyre, Walter Summerhill 16 Highpark Road Coylton Ayrshire, KA6 6QL / GB | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2009/37] | Day, Caroline Margaret, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2008/41] | Day, Caroline Margaret, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Williamson, Brian OLSWANG 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Moran, Paula OLSWANG 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250859.5 | 15.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | GB20040003500 | 17.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0403500 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1564335 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1564335 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03F3/02 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
E03F5/102 (EP);
E03F3/02 (EP,GB);
E03F3/04 (GB);
E03F5/10 (GB);
E03F5/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | Entwässerungsdurchflussregelungssystem | [2005/33] | English: | Drainage system flow regulation | [2005/33] | French: | Système de régulation du débit de drainage | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 09.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/08] | 20.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2642723 (GEORGE REISMANN); | [Y]FR2643971 (SIKORA BERNARD [FR]); | [X]DE4220880 (DEDERLE KLAUS [DE]); | [XY]US6164869 (GUTHLER HARALD [DE], et al) |