EP1574345 - Position deviation detecting method and image forming device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Ricoh Company 1-3-6, Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitao, Katsuyuki 4-16-12-101, Midorigaoka Zama-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05250959.3 | 21.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | JP20040045077 | 20.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004045077 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574345 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1574345 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574345 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/47, B41J2/21, G03G15/00, H04N1/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/6033 (EP,US);
G03G15/0131 (EP,US);
G03G15/50 (EP,US);
H04N1/58 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0119 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0129 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | B41J2/47, B41J2/21 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/51] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erfassen einer Positionsabweichung und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2005/37] | English: | Position deviation detecting method and image forming device | [2005/37] | French: | Méthode pour détecter une déviation de position et dispositif de formation d'image | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1074894 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4* figures 18,19 *; | [X]US6408156 (MIYAZAKI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003210412 (ISHIBASHI HITOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0478005 | US2003020930 | by applicant | US156 | US6408 | EP0478005 | EP0944242 | EP1074894 | US2003020930 | US2003210412 |