EP1589421 - Information processing system, information processing method, and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Ryohei Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251074.0 | 24.02.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | JP20040056777 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004056777 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1589421 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1589421 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F17/30 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungssystem, -verfahren und -programm | [2005/43] | English: | Information processing system, information processing method, and computer program | [2005/43] | French: | Système, méthode et programme de traitement de données | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 14.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9315457 (PARALLEL PCS INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * figures 1-3 ** abstract *; | [A]US6098091 (KISOR GREG [US]) [A] 1-21 * figures 1-5 * * column 3, lines 61-67 * * columns 4-5 * * column 7, line 11 - line 21 *; | [A]US6112225 (KRAFT REINER [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * figure 5 * * abstract * | by applicant | US6098091 | JP2002342165 | JP2002351850 | JP2002358289 | JP2002366533 | JP2002366534 |