EP1580919 - Communications systems, method and device in MIMO systems with time domain spreading [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNamara, Darren Phillip, Toshiba Res. Europe Ltd. 32 Quenn square Bristol BS1 4ND / GB | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Richardson, Mark Jonathan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Richardson, Mark Jonathan Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251150.8 | 25.02.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | GB20040004451 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0404451 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580919 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1580919 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/04 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H04L5/026 (EP,GB,US);
H04B7/06 (EP,GB,US);
H04B7/08 (EP,GB,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/24] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funkkommunikationssysteme, -verfahren und -einrichtung für MIMO-Systeme mit Zeitbereichsspreiz | [2005/39] | English: | Communications systems, method and device in MIMO systems with time domain spreading | [2005/39] | French: | Systèmes, procédé et dispositif de communications dans des systèmes MIMO avec étalement de domaine temporel | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2004040788 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [PX]WO2004075436 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); |