EP1571790 - Secure routing method for ad hoc networks, corresponding mobile node [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/36] | Secure routing method for ad hoc networks, corresponding mobile node and network system | ||
[2014/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. I.P. Dept. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Hidenori, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. I.P. Dept. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Umeda, Narumi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. I.P. Dept. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251257.1 | 02.03.2005 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | JP20040058072 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004058072 | JP20040250816 | 30.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004250816 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571790 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1571790 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/701 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
H04L45/34 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04W12/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/31] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum sicheren Routing in ad hoc Netzwerken, zugehöriges mobiles Endgerät | [2014/16] | English: | Secure routing method for ad hoc networks, corresponding mobile node | [2014/16] | French: | Procédé de routage sécurisé pour des réseaux ad hoc, terminal | [2014/16] |
Former [2005/36] | Verfahren zum sicheren Routing in ad hoc Netzwerken, zugehöriges mobiles Endgerät und Netzwerksystem | ||
Former [2005/36] | Secure routing method for ad hoc networks, corresponding mobile node and network system | ||
Former [2005/36] | Procédé de routage sécurisé pour des réseaux ad hoc, terminal et système correspondant | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004025018 (HAAS ZYGMUNT J [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0020] - [0048] , [0057] *; | [XY] - GHAZIZADEH S ET AL, "Security-aware adaptive dynamic source routing protocol", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 2002. PROCEEDINGS. LCN 2002. 27TH ANNUAL IEEE CONFERENCE ON 6-8 NOV.2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021106), ISBN 0-7695-1591-6, pages 751 - 760, XP010628240 [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [03.3] - [0004] - [04.2] * [Y] 5,7,8 | [X] - SANZGIRI K ET AL, "A secure routing protocol for ad hoc networks", NETWORK PROTOCOLS, 2002. PROCEEDINGS. 10TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NOV. 12-15, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021112), ISBN 0-7695-1856-7, pages 78 - 87, XP010632569 [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [5.1.5] * | [Y] - TANENBAUM, ANDREW, Computer networks, PRENTICE HALL, (20020831), XP002330888 [Y] 5 * page 757, paragraph 8.4.2 - page 758 * | [X] - ZHOU L ET AL, "SECURING AD HOC NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199911), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 24 - 30, XP000875728 [X] 3 * page 25, column R, line 18 - page 26, column R, line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.806983 | [XY] - EL-KHATIB K ET AL, "Secure dynamic distributed routing algorithm for ad hoc wireless networks", PARALLEL PROCESSING WORKSHOPS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 6-9 OCT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031006), ISBN 0-7695-2018-9, pages 359 - 366, XP010664136 [X] 4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [45.1] , [05.3] , [05.4] , [7.1.1] * [Y] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPPW.2003.1240390 | [PX] - BO ZHU ET AL, "Anonymous secure routing in mobile ad-hoc networks", COMPUTATIONAL SYSTEMS BIOINFORMATICS CONFERENCE, 2004. CSB 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 IEEE TAMPA, FL, USA 16-18 NOV. 2004, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE (COMPUT. SOC, US, (20041116), ISBN 0-7695-2260-2, pages 102 - 108, XP010753063 [PX] 4,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * | [A] - KENG, SENG NG; SEAH, "Routing security and data confidentiality for mobile ad hoc networks", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE 2003, (20030425), vol. 3, pages 1821 - 1825, XP002330887 [A] 1,3,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] * | [A] - MIR R N ET AL, "Secure distributed routing in ad hoc networks", IEEE TENCON 2003. CONFERENCE ON CONVERGENT TECHNOLOGIES FOR THE ASIA-PACIFIC REGION. BANGALORE, INDIA, OCT. 15 - 17, 2003, IEEE REGION 10 ANNUAL CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031015), VOL. 4 OF 4. CONF. 18, ISBN 0-7803-8162-9, pages 1091 - 1095, XP010687434 [A] 1 * paragraph [03.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.2003.1273416 |