EP1574262 - Cleaning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petty, Robert Hugh 16 Harthope Close, Rickleton Washington NE38 9DZ / GB | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth Suite 14 I6, Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE1 4XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251429.6 | 09.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | GB20040005337 | 09.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0405337 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574262 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574262 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/02, B44D3/00, B08B3/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B08B3/02 (EP);
B05B15/55 (EP);
B08B3/006 (EP);
B08B3/04 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Reinigungsgerät | [2005/37] | English: | Cleaning apparatus | [2005/37] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | IT | 30.07.2008 | LT | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | PL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | ES | 10.11.2008 | IS | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | HU | 31.01.2009 | IE | 09.03.2009 | LU | 09.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
LU | 09.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
LU | 09.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 09.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5107876 (OZYJIWSKY ROMAN S [AU]) [X] 1,15,18,22 * abstract *; | [X]US5213117 (YAMAMOTO SOICHIRO [CA]) [X] 1,15,18,22 * abstract *; | [X]US5265633 (KNOWLTON GLENN C [US]) [X] 1-4,15,18,22 * column 3 *; | [X]EP0799651 (FILLON PICHON [FR]) [X] 1,15,18,22* abstract *; | [X]US5704381 (MILLAN JORGE A [US], et al) [X] 1,15,18,22 * column 5 * |