EP1574755 - Sub-assembly for an actuator assembly, latch assembly, and method of manufacturing a sub-assembly for an actuator assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/37] | Actuator assembly | ||
[2005/40] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems (UK) Ltd Fordhouse Lane, Stirchley Birmingham West Midlands, B30 3BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems (UK) Ltd Fordhouse Lane, Stirchley Birmingham West Midlands, B30 3BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fisher, Sidney Edward 24 Underwood Close Callow Hill Redditch Worcestershire, B97 5YS / GB | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251503.8 | 11.03.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | GB20040005695 | 13.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0405695 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1574755 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Classification | IPC: | F16H33/06, H02K7/06, E05B47/00, E05B65/12 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
E05B81/25 (EP);
H02K7/10 (EP);
E05B2015/0427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Baugruppe einer Antriebsvorrichtung, , Verriegelungsvorrichtung, und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Baugruppe einer Antriebsvorrichtung | [2005/37] | English: | Sub-assembly for an actuator assembly, latch assembly, and method of manufacturing a sub-assembly for an actuator assembly | [2005/40] | French: | Sous-ensemble pour un ensemble actionneur, dispositif de verrouillage, et procédé de fabrication d'un sous-ensemble pour un ensemble actionneur | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/37] | Actuator assembly | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |