EP1598958 - Observation apparatus and observation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | For:FR
GB
IT
Independent Administrative Institution Japan Agency for Marine-Earth Science and Technology 2-15, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 2370061 / JP | [2007/52] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Independent Administrative Institution Japan Agency for Marine-Earth Science and Technology 2-15, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 2370061 / JP | |||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Independent Administrative Institution Japan Agency for Marine-Earth Science and Technology 2-15, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 2370061 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Junichi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Tokura, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Asakawa, Kenichi, Japan Agency for Marine-Earth Science and Technology, 2-15, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0061 / JP | 04 /
Munehira, Hiroaki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
Mikada, Hitoshi, c/o Japan Agency for Marine-Earth Science and Technology, 2-15, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0061 / JP | 06 /
Kawaguchi, K., c/o Japan Agency for Marine-Earth Science and Technology, 2-15, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0061 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk Incorporating Lloyd Wise 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/47] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251653.1 | 18.03.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040149337 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004149337 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598958 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08, H04B10/17 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H04B10/291 (EP,US);
H04B10/0771 (EP,US);
H04B2210/074 (EP,US);
H04B2210/078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [2006/30] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überwachungsvorrichtung und -system | [2005/47] | English: | Observation apparatus and observation system | [2005/47] | French: | Dispositif et système d'observation | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5485299 (JONES KEVAN P [GB]) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 9; figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [X]EP0751635 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-19* column 2, line 1 - line 32; figures 8,9 * | Examination | US4436365 | by applicant | US4436365 | US5485299 | EP0751635 | JP2002040152 |