EP1579810 - Biopsy device for use with a MRI machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/39] | Biopsy device | ||
[2005/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsonton, Mark 6802 Fairwind Court Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 02 /
Thompson, Eric 6577 Xenia Trail Pleasant Plain, Ohio 45162 / US | [2007/48] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
Tsonton, Mark 6802 Fairwind Court Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | ||
02 /
Thompson, Eric 6577 Xenia Trail Pleasant Plain Ohio 45162 / US | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251797.6 | 23.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | US20040808078 | 24.03.2004 Original published format: US 808078 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579810 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579810 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B17/06 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00911 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
G01R33/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/24] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MRT-kompatibles Biopsiegerät | [2005/39] | English: | Biopsy device for use with a MRI machine | [2005/42] | French: | Instrument de biopsie compatible avec un appareil d' IRM | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/39] | Biopsy device | Examination procedure | 06.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6258071 (BROOKES JOCELYN ASHER SIMON [GB]) [X] 1-3,7* column 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2003032895 (FISHER JOHN S [US]) [Y] 1,5,7,9,10 * figures 1,2 *; | [DY]US2003109803 (HUITEMA THOMAS W [US], et al) [DY] 1,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0021] - [0023] - [0035]; figures 1-6; claim 1 * |