EP1592000 - Laser/detector device for optical recording with adjustable detector position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Wai-Hon 1245 Magdalena Court Los Altos California 94024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Lee, Wai-Hon 1245 Magdalena Court Los Altos California 94024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05251939.4 | 29.03.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | US20040832921 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: US 832921 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592000 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1592000 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/12, G11B7/22 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
G11B7/1275 (EP,US);
G11B7/123 (EP,US);
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/22 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | Laser- / Detektionsvorrichtung für optische Aufzeichnung mit justierbarer Detektorposition | [2005/44] | English: | Laser/detector device for optical recording with adjustable detector position | [2005/44] | French: | Dispositif laser / de détection pour enregistrement optique à position de détecteur ajustable | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 10.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0202689 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,15 * page 13, line 9 - line 20 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5710672 (ROBERTS DAVID ANTHONY [GB], et al) [X] 1,15 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 22 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 29 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-7,9,12,14-18,20; | [A]EP0860819 (HOETRON INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002018432 (OHUCHIDA SHIGERU [JP]) [Y] 2-7,9,12,14-18,20 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 1,2,13,16,22 *; | [A]US2002093893 (MATSUDA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-4,7 * |