EP1591108 - Solution formulations of sirolimus and its analogs for CAD treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [2016/11] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falotico, Robert 40 Black Horse Run Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
Zhao, Jonathon Z. 12 Briar Hill Court Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/44] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252016.0 | 31.03.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | US20040813965 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 813965 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591108 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591108 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591108 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/10, A61K31/436, A61K47/22, A61L31/16 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | A61K9/22, A61K47/10, A61K31/436 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Formulierungen von Sirolimus und seine Analoge in Lösungsform zur Behandlung von koronaren Herzkrankheit | [2005/44] | English: | Solution formulations of sirolimus and its analogs for CAD treatment | [2005/44] | French: | Formulations en solution de sirolimus et ses analogues pour le traitement de la coronaropathie | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2005 | AT | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | LU | 31.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.03.2005 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9319763 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * example - *; | [A]EP0950386 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5 - page 6 ** claim - *; | [X]US2003170287 (PRESCOTT MARGARET FORNEY [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * example 3 * * paragraph [0067]; claim - *; | [X]WO2004011000 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * example - * |