EP1586935 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION ELECTRIC CO., Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-Cho Takefu-City Fukui 915-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states ORION ELECTRIC CO., Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-Cho Takefu-City Fukui 915-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akagawa, Kouji, c/o Orion Electric Co. Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-cho Takefu-city, Fukui 915-8555 / JP | 02 /
Nishida, Kazufumi, c/o Orion Electric Co. Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-cho Takefu-city, Fukui 915-8555 / JP | 03 /
Yonezu, Yoshikazu, c/o Orion Electric Co. Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-cho Takefu-city, Fukui 915-8555 / JP | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252204.2 | 07.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | JP20040115877 | 09.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004115877 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586935 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1586935 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
G02F2201/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige | [2005/42] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [2005/42] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 14.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US6671012 (TANAKA YUKINORI [JP]) [XD] 1,2* column 1, line 14 - line 34; figures 14-16 * |