EP1584692 - Method of nucleic acid analysis, nucleic acid analysis device and disk for nucleic acid analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD. 16-20 Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [2007/41] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD. 16-20 Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagiwara, Naoto 16-20 Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | 02 /
Ishiguro, Takashi 16-20 Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0005 / JP | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/41] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252232.3 | 08.04.2005 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | JP20040116173 | 09.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004116173 | [2005/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1584692 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1584692 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584692 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01L3/00 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
G01N21/253 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
B01L2300/024 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0806 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0861 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1861 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nukleinsäure Analyse, Vorrichtung zur Nukleinsäure Analyse und Platte für eine Nukleinsäure Analyse | [2007/17] | English: | Method of nucleic acid analysis, nucleic acid analysis device and disk for nucleic acid analysis | [2005/41] | French: | Procédé d'analyse d'acide nucléique, appareil d'analyse d'acide nucléique et disque pour l'analyse d'acide nucléique | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/41] | Verfahren zur Nukleinsäure Analyse, Vorrichtung zur Nukleinsäure Analyse und Platte für eine Nikleinsäure Analyse | Examination procedure | 11.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | BE | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | CZ | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | EE | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | LT | 10.10.2007 | PL | 10.10.2007 | RO | 10.10.2007 | SI | 10.10.2007 | SK | 10.10.2007 | TR | 10.10.2007 | BG | 10.01.2008 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | IS | 10.02.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | IE | 08.04.2008 | LU | 08.04.2008 | HU | 11.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
TR | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
LU | 08.04.2008 | ||
HU | 11.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
LU | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SI | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
EE | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
RO | 10.10.2007 | ||
SK | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CZ | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
LT | 10.10.2007 | ||
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | LT | 10.10.2007 | |
PL | 10.10.2007 | ||
BG | 10.01.2008 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IS | 10.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KOPP ET AL, "chemical amplification:continuous flow PCR on a chip", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19980515), vol. 280, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1046 - 1048, XP002107956 [A] 1-24 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.280.5366.1046 | [A] - LIU J ET AL, "A NANOLITER ROTARY DEVICE FOR POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", ELECTROPHORESIS, WEINHEIM, DE, (2002), vol. 23, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 1531 - 1536, XP002332356 [A] 1-24 * page 1532, paragraph 2.1; page 1534, paragraph 2.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1522-2683(200205)23:10<1531::AID-ELPS1531>3.0.CO;2-D | [A] - SCHNEEGASS I ET AL, "MINIATURIZED FLOW-THROUGH PCR WITH DIFFERENT TEMPLATE TYPES IN A SILICON CHIP THERMOCYCLER", LAB ON A CHIP, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200109), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 42 - 49, XP009030439 [A] 1-24 * page 43, figure 1; page 44, figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b103846j | [A] - ZOVAL J V ET AL, "Centrifuge-based fluidic platforms", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE IEEE USA, (200401), vol. 92, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 140 - 153, XP002341782 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2003.820541 |