EP1587109 - Editing system for audiovisual works and corresponding text for television news [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avid Technology, Inc. 75 Network Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2010/49] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states AVID TECHNOLOGY, INC. Avid Technology Park, One Park West Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Johnathon E. 6 Arlington Street Amesbury, Massachusetts 01913 / US | 02 /
Procops, Roy 7 Benton Street Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252362.8 | 15.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | US20040562925P | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 562925 P | US20050086149 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: US 86149 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587109 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/031, G06F17/30 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Title | German: | Schnittsystem für audiovisuellen Inhalt und dazugehörigen Text für Fernsehnachrichten. | [2005/42] | English: | Editing system for audiovisual works and corresponding text for television news | [2005/42] | French: | Système d'édition des contenus audiovisuels et texte correspondant utilisé pour la réalisation des journaux télévisés. | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5801685 (MILLER ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 65 * * column 18, line 14 - line 67; figures 3-6 *; | [A]US6038573 (PARKS DAVID MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 60 ** column 6, line 35 - column 10, line 18; figure 2 *; | [XA]US6404978 (ABE KEIKO [JP]) [X] 5-8,13-16 * column 1, line 53 - column 7, line 5; figure - * [A] 1-4,9-12 |