EP1591415 - Nanostructured surfaces having variable permeability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroupenkine, Timofei Nikita 22 Red Hill Road Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 02 /
Mandich, Mary Louise 1037 Vosseller Avenue Martinsville, NJ 08836 / US | 03 /
Taylor, Joseph Ashley 7c Stone Hill Road, Apt. C. Springfield, NJ 07081 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/44] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limted, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252369.3 | 15.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | US20040835639 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 835639 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591415 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591415 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591415 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B81B1/00, B05D7/24, C03C17/00 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
B01D69/10 (EP,KR,US);
B65H75/30 (KR);
B81B1/008 (EP,US);
B65H2403/60 (KR);
B65H2701/36 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
F16F1/3605 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | B82B3/00, B05D7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2007/04] |
Former [2006/47] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/29] | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nanostrukturierte Oberflächen mit variabler Permeabilität | [2006/12] | English: | Nanostructured surfaces having variable permeability | [2005/44] | French: | Surface nano-structurée avec perméabilité variable | [2006/12] |
Former [2005/44] | Nanostrukturierte Oberflächen mit variabler Wasserdurchlässigkeit | ||
Former [2005/44] | Surface nano-structuré avec perméabilité variable | Examination procedure | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 31.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6185961 (TONUCCI RONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US2002115747 (FELDHEIM DANIEL L [US], et al); | [A]WO03016040 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]US2003080049 (LEE SOO-BOK [KR], et al); |