EP1587099 - Reduced recovery time for perpendicular recording systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems, Inc. 1110 American Parkway, NE Allentown, PA 18109 / US | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolan, Daniel J. 9500 Kimbo Ave., South Cottage Grove, MN 55016 / US | 02 /
Howley, James P. 3575 Boulder Circle, No. 102 Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | 03 /
Keirn, Zachary 624 Colt Drive Loveland, CO 80537 / US | 04 /
Feyh, German 1272 Bear Mountain Court Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 05 /
Straub, Michael P. 515 Bross Street Longmont, CO 80501 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252398.2 | 18.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | US20040562703P | 17.04.2004 Original published format: US 562703 P | US20050091352 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: US 91352 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587099 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1587099 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B5/09 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G11B20/10203 (EP,US);
G04B47/00 (KR);
G04B37/0008 (KR);
G04B37/125 (KR);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/1403 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (EP,US);
G11B5/1278 (EP,US);
H04H40/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2005/42] | G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | [2006/36] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verringerte Erholungsszeit für senkrechte Aufzeichnung | [2005/42] | English: | Reduced recovery time for perpendicular recording systems | [2005/42] | French: | Temps de recouvrement réduit pour enregistrement perpendiculaire | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/11] | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6133784 (GREGOIRE BERNARD R [US]) [A] 1-3,10-12,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6252459 (FRANCK STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1,10,20* column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 20 *; | [XA]EP1174874 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10-12,14,16,19,20 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * [A] 4,13; | [A]US2002034031 (SAKAI YUJI [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,10,11,13,20 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0072] *; | [X]EP1205928 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,10-12,15,17,19,20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] *; | [XA]US6404578 (BHANDARI SANJAY M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-12,14,16,18-20 * column 5 - column 6 * * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 52 * [A] 4,13 |