EP1596149 - Heat exchangers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Akimichi, c/o Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252897.3 | 11.05.2005 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | JP20040143727 | 13.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004143727 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1596149 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1596149 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/18, F28D1/053 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
F28F9/182 (EP,US);
F28D1/05375 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2005/46] | English: | Heat exchangers | [2005/46] | French: | Echangeurs de chaleur | [2005/46] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH02242095 ; | [A]JPH10332294 ; | [X]US4458749 (MELNYK WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12,14,15,18 * column 2, line 23 - line 65 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0665414 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]US5458190 (SASAKI HIRONAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1132706 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-12,18 * paragraphs [0057] , [0062] , [0063] , [0072] - [0077] * * figures 3-14 *; | [X]US6453988 (NAKADO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10,15,18 * paragraphs [0051] , [0056] * * figures 2-5 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901217), vol. 014, no. 567, Database accession no. (M - 1059), & JP02242095 A 19900926 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [DX] 1,2,5,6,9-11,14,15,18 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10332294 A 19981215 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * |