EP1596090 - Parking brake assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, Royston Leonard 44 Brunel Avenue Rogerstone Newport NP10 0DN / GB | 02 /
Taylor, Martin Pors Bryn Tawel Wesley Close Cwmbran Torfaen NP44 3ND / GB | 03 /
Clarke, Lester 3 Greenside Cottage North Aston Oxon OX25 6HU / GB | 04 /
Breakwell, Norman 18 Ventnor Road Old Cwmbran Cwmbran Torfaen NP44 3JY South Wales / GB | 05 /
Kinder, Adrian R. 14 Hove Avenue Newport N19 7QP South Wales / GB | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2005/46] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05252973.2 | 13.05.2005 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | GB20040010838 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0410838 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1596090 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/14 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
F16D65/183 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2125/28 (EP,US);
F16D2127/06 (EP,US);
F16D2129/02 (EP,US);
F16D2129/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Title | German: | Feststellbremse | [2005/46] | English: | Parking brake assembly | [2005/46] | French: | Frein de stationnement | [2005/46] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02073058 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-8,10 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 24; figures 1-6 * * page 7, line 1 - line 30; figures 7-10 *; | [X]WO2004005099 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10* the whole document * | by applicant | US6435319 |