EP1598847 - Color cathode ray tube apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd. 1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd. 1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Hirofumi 5-A406, Higashiooda 3-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0012 / JP | 02 /
Wada, Yasufumi 2-13-4, Okutenjin-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1118 / JP | 03 /
Tomoyasu, Hiroyuki 1-43-913, Shimeien Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0045 / JP | 04 /
Morimoto, Hiroji 3-2-11, Minamiyagi-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 634-0077 / JP | 05 /
Ishihara, Tomonari 3-9-8-503, Masago Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0851 / JP | 06 /
Takekawa, Tsutomu 3-9-8-301, Masago Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0851 / JP | 07 /
Nishiyama, Koji 4-1-43, Kitakasugaoka Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0048 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253064.9 | 18.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | JP20040149580 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004149580 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598847 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598847 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/48 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H01J29/48 (EP,US);
H01J29/488 (EP,US);
H01J29/503 (EP,US);
H01J31/206 (EP,US);
H01J2229/481 (EP,US);
H01J2229/4817 (EP,US);
H01J2229/4875 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/37] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Farbkathodenstrahlröhre | [2005/47] | English: | Color cathode ray tube apparatus | [2005/47] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques couleur | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001357796 ; | [Y]EP0499360 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [Y] 5 * column 10, lines 30-50; figure 2 *; | [X]US2002079818 (CHO SUNG HO [KR]) [X] 1 * figure 8; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US2002130608 (TOUJOU TSUTOMU [JP]) [Y] 7* paragraph [0043]; figure 1b *; | [Y]US6583547 (NAKAYAMA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, lines 15-30; figure 4 *; | [XY]EP1349193 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0013]; figures 3,9,10,12 * [Y] 5,7,2,4; | [Y]US6642646 (KWON OH SO [KR]) [Y] 2,4 * columns 2,5-6, lines 36-43,50-10; figure 5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001357796 A 20011226 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * |