EP1605725 - Wireless positioning approach using time delay estimates of multipath components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Qi, Yihong c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Suda, Hirohito c/o Intellectual Property Dept. NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Asai, Takahiro c/o Intellectual Property Dept. NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253443.5 | 03.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | JP20040171819 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004171819 | JP20040255916 | 02.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004255916 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1605725 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Positionsbestimmung in drahtlosen Netzwerken unter Verwendung von Zeitverzögerungsschätzungen der Mehrwegekomponenten | [2005/50] | English: | Wireless positioning approach using time delay estimates of multipath components | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé de localisation dans un réseau sans fil à partir d estimées de retard des composants multivoies | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP07006026.4 / EP1793643 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9814018 (UNIV RUTGERS [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - line 26 *; | [A]WO03025614 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 13, line 4 - line 32 *; | [Y]US2003125026 (TSUNEHARA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 60 - paragraph 63 * * page 4, paragraph 65 *; | [Y]WO03056849 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al)[Y] 1-14; | [PY]EP1469685 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [PY] 1-14 * abstract * * page 6, line 15 - line 57 * * page 7, line 14 - line 20 *; | [Y] - LI CONG ET AL, "Non-line-of-sight error mitigation in mobile location", INFOCOM 2004. TWENTY-THIRD ANNUALJOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES HONG KONG, PR CHINA 7-11 MARCH 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040307), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-8355-9, pages 650 - 659, XP010740486 [Y] 1,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2004.1354467 | [Y] - YIHONG QI ET AL, "On geolocation accuracy with prior information in non-line-of-sight environment", VTC 2002-FALL. 2002 IEEE 56TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. VANCOUVER, CANADA, SEPT. 24 - 28, 2002, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020924), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 56, ISBN 0-7803-7467-3, pages 285 - 288, XP010608563 [Y] 1,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2002.1040350 |