EP1610311 - Optical recording/reproducing apparatus and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Bong-gi 906-503, Byeokjeokgol 9danji Apt Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Soo-han 511-901, Jinsan-maeul Samsung 5th Apt, 1161 Pungdeokcheon-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Pae, Jung-gug 544-202, Sinnamusil Jugong 5danji Ssangyong Apt Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Chun-seong 321-902, Samik Apt Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/17] |
Former [2005/52] | 01 /
Kim, Bong-gi 906-503, Byeokjeokgol 9danji Apt Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Park, Soo-han 511-901, Jinsan-maeul Samsung 5th Apt, 1161 Pungdeokcheon-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Pae, Jung-gug 544-202, Sinnamusil Jugong 5danji Ssangyong Apt Yeongtong-dong/gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Park, Chun-seong 321-902, Samik Apt Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2005/52] | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253480.7 | 07.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | KR20040047191 | 23.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004047191 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610311 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1610311 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1610311 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085, G11B7/09, G11B7/095 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G11B7/093 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/0932 (EP,US);
G11B7/0945 (EP,US);
G11B7/0956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2007/43] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Schreib/Lese-Gerät und Verfahren zur Steuerung desselben | [2005/52] | English: | Optical recording/reproducing apparatus and method for controlling the same | [2005/52] | French: | Appareil de lécture et d'écriture optique et procédé de control du même | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0472084 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13,16-22 * column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 49; figures 1-5 * * column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 49; figures 1-5 * [A] 14,15; | [Y]US6134058 (MOHRI MASANARI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13,16-22 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 41; figure 11 *; | [Y]US2002150002 (PAE JUNG-GUG [KR], et al) [Y] 8,9,16,17,21,22 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP1282119 (OPTWARE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13,16-22 * paragraphs [0045] - [0050] - [0080] - [0085]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2003147314 (KONDO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0136] - [0199]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2003156529 (TAJIRI NOBORU [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1339052 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-7,10-13,18-20 * paragraphs [0020] - [0026]; figure 5 *; | [YA]US6625093 (HONG SEONG PYO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-13,16-22 * column 15,line 4 - column 17,line 63 * * column 27,line 54 - column 28,line 11 * * column 15,line 4 - column 17,line 63 * * column 27,line 54 - column 28,line 11 * [A] 14,15; | [Y]KR20040016502 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD)[Y] 1-13,16-22; | [PY]US2005036409 (HONG DONG-KI [KR], et al) [PY] 1-13,16-22 * paragraphs [0020] - [0050] * | by applicant | EP0472084 | US6134058 | US2002150002 | EP1282119 | US2003156529 | EP1339052 | US6625093 | KR100403586B |