EP1610206 - System and method for performing power sequencing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 415 Maetan dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyoung-su 647-1103 Sejong Apt., 1145 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2005/52] | Davies, Robert Ean, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253481.5 | 07.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | KR20040046616 | 22.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004046616 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610206 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26, G05F1/46 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G06F1/26 (EP,US);
H02M3/28 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Durchführung der Einschaltreihenfolge der Energieversorgung | [2005/52] | English: | System and method for performing power sequencing | [2005/52] | French: | Système et procédé pour effectuer une mise en route séquentielle d'alimentation | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 30.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |