EP1607061 - Electrosurgical handpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garito, Jon C. 3333 Royal Avenue Oceanside New York 11572 / US | For all designated states Ellman, Alan G. 3333 Royal Avenue Oceanside New York 11572 / US | [2010/03] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Garito, Jon C. 3333 Royal Avenue Oceanside New York 11572 / US | ||
For all designated states Ellman, Alan G. 3333 Royal Avenue Oceanside New York 11572 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253516.8 | 08.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | US20040866630 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 866630 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1607061 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1607061 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607061 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (KR);
A61B18/1482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2918 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00916 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1475 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1495 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/47] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrochirurgisches Handstück | [2005/51] | English: | Electrosurgical handpiece | [2005/51] | French: | Pièce à main électrochirurgicale | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2355521 (MENDEZ RENE [FR]) [A] 1-4 * column 6, paragraphs 1-3; figures 5,6 *; | [XA]DE4337590 (HUETTINGER MEDTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 14; figures 1,5b,6b,7a * [A] ; | [X]US5919191 (LENNOX CHARLES D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 21 *; | [DX]US6231571 (ELLMAN ALAN G [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4 * column 7, line 8 - line 20; figures 13-19 *; | [A]US6231570 (TU HOSHENG [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 6, line 53 - line 57 *; | [X]US6428538 (BLEWETT JEFFREY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 13,14 *; | [PXL]US2005107779 (ELLMAN ALAN G [US], et al) [PXL] 1,2,4* the whole document * | by applicant | US6352533 |