EP1604593 - Securing arrangement for a stair covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whiting, Richard Anthony Room 22, The College Business Centre, Uttoxeter New Road Derby DE22 3WZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Whiting, Richard Anthony Room 22, The College Business Centre, Uttoxeter New Road Derby DE22 3WZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Lacey, Dean Andrew, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Lacey, Dean Andrew, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2005/50] | Lock, Howard John Swindell & Pearson, 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253526.7 | 09.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | GB20040013063 | 11.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0413063 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604593 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47G27/06, E04F11/16 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
A47G27/06 (EP);
E04F11/166 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Sicherungsanordnung für Treppenbekleidung | [2005/50] | English: | Securing arrangement for a stair covering | [2005/50] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour revêtement de marche d'escalier | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE957345 (OSCAR BRAUN) [X] 1-3,7,9-15,17* figure - *; | [X]DE20300424U (KUENNE HERMANN FRIEDRICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13-16 * abstract * |