EP1605469 - Reduced power programming of non-volatile cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saifun Semiconductors Ltd. P.O. Box 8385 42504 Netanya / IL | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maayan, Eduardo 11 Nahshon Street Kfar Saba 44447 / IL | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253534.1 | 09.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | US20040864500 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 864500 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605469 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605469 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/10, G11C16/04, G11C16/12, G11C16/24 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/0475 (EP,US);
G11C16/0491 (EP,US);
G11C16/12 (EP,US);
G11C16/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | G11C16/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leistungsreduziertes Programmieren von nicht flüchtigen Speicherzellen | [2005/50] | English: | Reduced power programming of non-volatile cells | [2005/50] | French: | Programmation d'une cellule de mémoire non-volatile à consommation d'énergie réduite | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5491657 (HADDAD SAMEER S [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 7a,7b *; | [A]US5767729 (SONG PAUL JEI-ZEN [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 5 - line 7 *; | [DY]US2001046150 (MAAYAN EDUARDO [IL], et al) [DY] 8,9,21,22* figures 11,12 *; | [DY]US2002132436 (ELIYAHU RON [IL], et al) [DY] 8,10,21,23 * figures 1-3 *; | [XAY]US6570787 (WANG ZHIGANG [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,19,20 * column 3, line 42 - line 59 * [A] 2-4 [Y] 8-10,21-23; | [A]US6714457 (HSU FU-CHANG [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 10a; claims 1,2 * |