EP1734795 - Lamp control units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sangamo Limited Port Glasgow Industrial Estate Port Glasgow Renfrewshire PA14 5XG / GB | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byers, David, c/o Sangamo Limited Port Glasgow Industrial Estate Port Glasgow, Renfrewshire PA14 5GX / GB | 02 /
Addies, Fraser James, c/o Sangamo Limited Port Glasgow Industrial Estate Port Glasgow, Renfrewshire PA14 5GX / GB | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Gray, John James, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Gray, John James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253637.2 | 13.06.2005 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734795 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
H05B47/16 (EP);
H05B47/11 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lampenregler | [2006/51] | English: | Lamp control units | [2006/51] | French: | Unité de commande pour une lampe | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4587417 (DUVE GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1,25 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US5160853 (SIMON TIM [US], et al); | [A]WO9627823 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI], et al); | [X]WO9831201 (SEO DAL HEE [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12,14-16,19,24,25 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 19; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5936362 (ALT LARRY G [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * column 2, line 44 - column 13, line 42; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US6160353 (MANCUSO MICHAEL L [US]) [Y] 17,18 * column 2, lines 20-23 * * column 6, line 33 - line 48; figure 10 *; | [Y]US2002010518 (REID DREW A [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0157] , [0184] , [0185] , [0508] * |