EP1607455 - Water base ink for ink-jet recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoi, Noriatsu, Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Ryuji, Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 03 /
Ohira, Hideo, Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 04 /
Fujioka, Masaya, Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Kawagishi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | 05 /
Higashiyama, Shunichi, Brother Kogyo K.K. 1-1 Kawagashi 1-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253658.8 | 14.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | JP20040176221 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004176221 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607455 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607455 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
C09D11/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tinte für das Tintenstrahldruckverfahren auf Wasserbasis | [2005/51] | English: | Water base ink for ink-jet recording | [2005/51] | French: | Encre aqueuse à jet d'encre | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0859036 (SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]) [X] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]EP0943666 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1035178 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1184429 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002059883 (TAKADA YUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1287993 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4373954 | JPS6034993 |