EP1621723 - System for loading executable code into volatile memory in a downhole tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTELLISERV INC 2185 S Larsen Pkwy Provo, UT 84606 / US | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hall, David R. 738 East 2680 North Provo Utah 84604 / US | 02 /
Bartholomew, David B. 497 South 1680 East Springville Utah 84663 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Monte L. 1063 South 500 East Orem Utah 84097 / US | [2009/37] |
Former [2006/05] | 01 /
Hall, David R. 738 East 2680 North Utah 84604 / US | ||
02 /
Bartholomew, David B. 497 South 1680 East Springville Utah 84663 / US | |||
03 /
Johnson, Monte L. 1063 South 500 East Orem Utah 84097 / US | Representative(s) | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk, 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05253956.6 | 25.06.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | US20040710638 | 27.07.2004 Original published format: US 710638 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1621723 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621723 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E21B44/00, E21B47/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
E21B47/12 (EP,US);
G06F8/654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/40] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Laden von Programmcodes in einem flüchtigen Speicher in einem Bohrwerkzeug | [2006/05] | English: | System for loading executable code into volatile memory in a downhole tool | [2006/05] | French: | Système de chargement d'un code exécutable dans la mémoire volatile d'un outil de fond de puits | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 02.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.09.2009 | IT | 09.09.2009 | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4739325 (MACLEOD NORMAN C [US]) [X] 1-32 * column 3, line 10 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 64 - column 3, line 68 * * column 5, line 21 - column 5, line 24 * * column 10, line 4 - column 10, line 13 * * column 12, line 37 - column 12, line 61; figure 3 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US6012015 (TUBEL PAULO [US]) [X] 33-37 * column 9, line 45 - column 9, line 50 * * column 13, line 8 - column 13, line 21; figure 4 *; | [Y]US6252518 (LABORDE GUY VACHON [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,7,32 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 23 * * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 17 *; | [Y]WO03101047 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [Y] 1,3,4,7,32* paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * | by applicant | US4739325 | US4815076 | US6061633 |