EP1611849 - Method of manufacturing integrated biosensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, David K. Kin-Brae House, 36 Culduthel Road Inverness, Inverness-shire IV2 4AP / GB | 02 /
Allen, John 1002 Oxford Court Mendota Heights, Minnesota 55118 / US | 03 /
Johnson, John 140 Blue Grass Circle Hendersonsville, Tennessee 37075 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/01] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254022.6 | 28.06.2005 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US20040881306 | 29.06.2004 Original published format: US 881306 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611849 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/1405 (KR);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Herstellungsmethode für integrierte Biosensoren | [2006/01] | English: | Method of manufacturing integrated biosensors | [2006/01] | French: | Méthode permettant la production de biocapteurs intégrés | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 11.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2002168290 (YUZHAKOV VADIM V [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0103] , [0114] , [0117] , [0120] *; | [A]US2003050573 (KUHR HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] ** paragraphs [0055] - [0060] *; | [A]US2004059365 (ABULHAJ RAMZI F [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figures 8-10 *; | [DA]US2004072357 (STIENE MATTHIAS [GB], et al) [DA] 1-4 * paragraph [0075] * * figure 5 * | by applicant | WO0164105 | WO0249507 | US2002168290 | WO03015627 | EP1360932 | US2003211619 | WO2004040287 |