EP1614669 - Reactive sealing compostions for hydrocarbon containing subterranean formations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heathman James F 23022 Lanham Katy Texas 77450 / US | 02 /
Dealy Sears T RR 3 Box 286 Comanche Okalhoma 73529 / US | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Wain, Christopher Paul A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05254060.6 | 29.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | US20040884373 | 02.07.2004 Original published format: US 884373 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1614669 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/02, E21B33/13 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C09K8/46 (EP,US);
C09K8/467 (EP,US);
C04B2103/0035 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/02, C04B14/104, C04B14/28, C04B22/0026, C04B22/0093, C04B2103/408, C04B2103/44 (EP,US);
C04B28/02, C04B14/104, C04B14/28, C04B22/0026, C04B22/0093, C04B24/20, C04B24/38 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/104, C04B14/28, C04B22/0026, C04B22/062, C04B2103/408, C04B2103/44 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/104, C04B14/28, C04B22/0026, C04B22/062, C04B24/226, C04B24/383 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/104, C04B14/28, C04B22/0026, C04B22/10, C04B24/22, C04B24/383 (US,EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/104, C04B14/28, C04B22/002, C04B22/062, C04B24/22, C04B24/383 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/37] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reaktive Dichtstoffe für kohlenwasserstoffhaltige unterirdische Formationen | [2006/02] | English: | Reactive sealing compostions for hydrocarbon containing subterranean formations | [2006/02] | French: | Compositions d'étanchéité réactives pour les formations souterraines contennant des hydrocarbures | [2006/04] |
Former [2006/02] | Compositions d'étanchéite réactives pour les formations souterraines contenant des hydrocarbures | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5447197 (RAE PHILIP [GB], et al) [X] 10 * column 3 - column 5; example 1; table 1 *[A] 1; | [X]US2003144374 (HEATHMAN JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5913364 | US6060434 | US6167967 | US6258757 |